Phillips v. Accel Logistics Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | E Scott Frost |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00035 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Accel Logistics Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Lance Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Transferring to Another Division
Thu 04/06 2:02 PM
Order To Transfer. Order transferring case to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 4/6/2017) (jak) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Thu 04/06 2:43 PM
Case copied to 3:17cv0971 N. Transfer to Dallas Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 04/05 4:46 PM
RESPONSE filed by Lance Phillips re:5 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (McGuire, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Tue 04/04 3:23 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court grants Plaintiff until 5/1/2017, to show cause why the Court should not transfer this case to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 4/4/2017) (mmg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Accel Logistics Inc. (jak) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 03/14 2:45 PM
Order And Notice Of Option To Consent To Proceed Before The Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 3/14/2017) (jak) Modified on 3/14/2017 (jak) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/14 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Lance Phillips on 01/03/2017. (McGuire, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Accel Logistics Inc filed by Lance Phillips. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8274825) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McGuire, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
qcref
Frost Mag Presider (Abilene)
Tue 03/14 2:44 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (jak) |