Akers v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00739 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Akers
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 06/10 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Before the Court is the Special Master James M. Stanton's notice to the Court that Plaintiff(s) have failed to respond to the Court's Show Cause Order issued on May 2, 2022 or May 3, 2022. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/10/2022) (chmb) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/10 2:35 PM
The Court previously entered a Show Cause Order requiring Plaintiff to show cause with 30 days why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Case Management Order No. 12 ("CMO 12"). The Defendant has notified the Special Master that the Plaintiff(s) have failed to respond to the Show Cause Order after having been provided the requisite notice and 30 days to cure. Accordingly, the case should be dismissed without prejudice. (Stanton, James M.) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 05/02 4:19 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff is instructed to show cause within thirty (30) days why the claim should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Case Management Order No. 12 ("CMO 12") [Dkt. 1054], because Defendant's Lead Counsel notified the Special Master that, after having been provided the requisite notice and 30 days to cure, Plaintiff has failed to fully comply with the requirements of CMO 12. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/2/2022) (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 03/14 1:40 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00086. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the transferring case to the Northern District of Texas, cto - 262, MDL No. 2244. (cwl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/14/2017.] | |
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Texas. (PKM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/14/2017.] | |
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Letter sent via e-mail to MDL Clerk with docket entries and complaint. (PKM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/14/2017.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS by Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(PKM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/14/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to DePuy, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/14/2017.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against DePuy, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643043399), filed by Arlene Akers.(MGB) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/14/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |