Martin v. United States of America
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00747 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1402 Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricke D Martin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
66 | 66
misc
Exhibits Returned or Destroyed
Wed 12/19 2:54 PM
Destruction of Exhibits offered by Ricke D Martin (EXH-ADM flag removed) (chmb) |