Life Partners Creditors' Trust et al v. Black Diamond Lifeplan Fund, LP et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Advanced Life Settlement Portfolio 2011-1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secure Wealth Holdings Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secure Wealth Holdings Fund II, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pillar Life Settlement Fund I, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pillar II Life Settlement Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pillar 5 Life Settlement Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pillar 4 Life Settlement Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pillar 3 Life Settlement Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New England Life Settlements Fund II, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New England Life Settlements Fund I, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New England Life Settlement Fund III, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Investment Council Fund II, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Investment Council Fund I, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Golden Eagle Life Settlements Fund 15, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Golden Eagle Life Settlements Fund 14, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Golden Eagle Life Settlements Fund 12, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Golden Eagle Life Settlement Fund I, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evergreen Life Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evergreen III Fund Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Evergreen II Lifeplan Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Blue Diamond Fund, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Black Diamond Lifeplan Fund, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Advanced Life Settlement Portfolio 2013-3, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Advanced Life Settlement Portfolio 2012-2, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
Case Admin Sup
|
|
Plaintiff
Life Partners Creditors' Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan M. Jacobs, as Trustee for the Life Partners Creditors' Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
66 | 66
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 06/22 4:04 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/22/2018) (skg) |
|
65 | 65
12
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 06/22 1:33 PM
ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.38 ). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/22/2018) (skg) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
64 | 64
trial
Trial Brief
Thu 06/21 5:34 PM
TRIAL BRIEF on Equitable Subordination by Alan M. Jacobs, Life Partners Creditors' Trust. (McGee, James) |
|
63 | 63
trial
Trial Brief
Thu 06/21 4:41 PM
TRIAL BRIEF on Equitable Subordination by Investment Council Fund I, LP, Investment Council Fund II, LP. (Brandon, Thomas) |
|
62 | 62
trial
Trial Brief
Thu 06/21 3:44 PM
TRIAL BRIEF on Defendants' Relevance Objections by Alan M. Jacobs, Life Partners Creditors' Trust. (McGee, James) |
|
61 | 61
5
pgs
trial
Trial Brief
Thu 06/21 3:39 PM
TRIAL BRIEF on Collateral Estoppel and Res Judicata by Alan M. Jacobs, Life Partners Creditors' Trust. (McGee, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
60 | 60
trial
Exhibit List
Wed 06/20 5:42 PM
Exhibit List , Deposition Testimony Designations and Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Exhibits by Alan M. Jacobs, Life Partners Creditors' Trust. (McGee, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Bice Deposition Designations, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Toy Deposition Designations, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Parties Joint Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Exhibits | ||
59 | 59
trial
Witness List
Wed 06/20 4:32 PM
Witness List by Alan M. Jacobs, Life Partners Creditors' Trust. (McGee, James) |
|
58 | 58
trial
Exhibit List
Wed 06/20 4:28 PM
Exhibit List by Investment Council Fund I, LP, Investment Council Fund II, LP. (Brandon, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Statement Regarding Defendants' Exhibit List | ||
57 | 57
trial
Exhibit List
Wed 06/20 4:26 PM
Exhibit List and Deposition Testimony Designations by Alan M. Jacobs, Life Partners Creditors' Trust. (McGee, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B | ||
56 | 56
trial
Witness List
Wed 06/20 3:36 PM
Witness List by Investment Council Fund I, LP, Investment Council Fund II, LP. (Brandon, Thomas) |
|
55 | 55
trial
Designation of Deposition
Wed 06/20 3:35 PM
Designation of Deposition by Investment Council Fund I, LP, Investment Council Fund II, LP. (Brandon, Thomas) |
|
54 | 54
trial
Pretrial Disclosures
Wed 06/20 2:52 PM
Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Pretrial Disclosures filed by Investment Council Fund I, LP, Investment Council Fund II, LP. (Brandon, Thomas) |