Garza v. Skinnier et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Mon 10/28 3:26 PM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to31 Notice of Appeal filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. Under 5TH CIR. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of October 28, 2019, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely pay the docketing fee. Issued as Mandate: 10/28/2019. (skg) |
|
Att: 1 USCA5 cover letter | ||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 08/02 4:57 PM
USCA Case Number 19-10843 in USCA5 for31 Notice of Appeal filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/26 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Erasmo Martinez Garza. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 07/26 10:50 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:31. Fri Jul 26 10:50:05 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Tue 06/25 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/25/2019) (skg) |
|
29 | 29
5
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Tue 06/25 2:20 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/25/2019) (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/25 2:24 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:29, 30. Tue Jun 25 14:24:20 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Request for Copy
Thu 06/13 4:44 PM
Request for Copy of Docket Sheet by Erasmo Martinez Garza. Copy of Docket Sheet mailed. (skg) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 12/06 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Erasmo Martinez Garza. New address: Erasmo Martinez Garza TDCJ No 1755676 TDCJ Connally Unit 899 FM 632 Kenedy, TX 78119. (skg) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Request
Tue 08/14 3:19 PM
Status Request by Erasmo Martinez Garza with Deputy Clerk Response (trt) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/14/2018) (trt) |
|
Att: 1 Deputy clerk response | ||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 05/07 3:51 PM
RESPONSE filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza re:24 District Court's Questionnaire. (skg) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judge's Questionnaire
Tue 04/24 4:03 PM
DISTRICT COURT'S QUESTIONNAIRE TO PLAINTIFF sent to ERASMO MARTINEZ GARZA. Responses due by 5/18/2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/24/2018) (plp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 04/24 4:04 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. Tue Apr 24 16:04:59 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 04/06 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Erasmo Martinez Garza. New address: Erasmo Martinez Garza TDCJ No 1755676 TDCJ Ellis Unit 1697 FM 980 Huntsville, TX 77343. (skg) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 03/22 3:40 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff's second amended complaint (ECF No.15 ) was filed along with his motion and is now the live pleading in this action. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/22/2018) (skg) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/22 3:38 PM
ORDER denying8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/22/2018) (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/22 3:41 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21, 22. Thu Mar 22 15:41:48 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Remark
Mon 03/05 3:23 PM
Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to the Defendants filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Remark
Mon 03/05 3:22 PM
Plaintiff's First request for Production of Documents filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Remark
Mon 03/05 3:22 PM
Exhibits in support of1 Complaint filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Request
Fri 03/02 3:12 PM
Status Request by Erasmo Martinez Garza with Deputy Clerk Response. (skg) |
|
Att: 1 Deputy Clerk's response | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Request
Tue 10/17 2:42 PM
Status Request by Erasmo Martinez Garza with Deputy Clerk Response. (skg) |
|
Att: 1 Deputy Clerk's response. | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/21 2:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Leave to File
Mon 08/21 2:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to File and Amended Complaint filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 07/31 7:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12, 13. Mon Jul 31 07:58:50 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Mon 07/31 7:58 AM
Second Order and Notice of Deficiency: Erasmo Martinez Garza must address the following deficiency: file a second amended complaint using the Courts form.. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 8/21/2017. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/28/2017) (trt) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Directing Full Payment
Mon 07/31 7:56 AM
FILING FEE ORDER. Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/28/2017) (trt) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 10:20 AM
Application to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/18 10:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Mon 04/03 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Erasmo Martinez Garza must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff must file an amended complaint using the Court's form. Plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. But Plaintiff must also file a certified inmate trust account statement. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies by April 24, 2017. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/3/2017) (baa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 04/03 3:50 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Mon Apr 3 15:50:53 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/30 4:15 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (baa) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Remark
Thu 03/30 4:14 PM
Correspondence to the Court, filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (baa) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 03/17 2:26 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Erasmo Martinez Garza. (*Clerk Note: Attached are best copies available) (baa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/17 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Proposed Summons, filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (baa) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 03/14 11:26 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (skg) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Tue 03/14 11:26 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 11:25 AM
Application to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. (skg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Erasmo Martinez Garza. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/14 11:27 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Tue Mar 14 11:27:23 CDT 2017 (crt) |