Nunziatina Paolini v. Kandi Technologies Group, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Consuelo B Marshall |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02025 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Xiaoming Hu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kandi Technologies Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bing Mei
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cheng Wang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xiaoying Zhu
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Anderson/Schweighart Group
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Sau Au
|
Represented By
|
Movant
David Garner
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Roberta Garner
|
Represented By
|
Movant
James O'Toole
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Michelle Thai
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Gary Vatter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nunziatina Paolini
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Tue 05/30 2:22 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment of Counsel,,25 filed by Movant James O'Toole. (Rohr, Barbara) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/30 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Mon 05/22 1:46 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment of Counsel,19 filed by Movant Michelle Thai. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/22 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Movant Michelle Thai. (Kathrein, Reed) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/22 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 23 filed by Movant Anderson/Schweighart Group. (Noblin, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 05/16 3:32 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Bing Mei, Xiaoming Hu, Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Xiaoying Zhu, Cheng Wang.(Fife, Ryan) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 05/15 8:49 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 17-cv-01930; 17-cv-01944; 17-cv-02932; and 17-cv-03049, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 27 filed by Movant Gary Vatter.(Pafiti, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Pomerantz Resume, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Bronstein Resume | ||
28 | 28
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 05/15 8:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 17-cv-01930; 17-cv-01944; 17-cv-02932; and 17-cv-03049, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 27 filed by Movant Gary Vatter. (Pafiti, Jennifer) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Consolidate Cases Appointment of Counsel
Mon 05/15 8:46 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 17-cv-01930; 17-cv-01944; 17-cv-02932; and 17-cv-03049,, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Movant Gary Vatter. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Pafiti, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/15 8:43 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Gary Vatter, (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Gary Vatter(pty:mov))(Pafiti, Jennifer) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Mon 05/15 8:19 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel OF JAMES OTOOLE AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by Movant James O'Toole. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attorney Barbara A Rohr added to party James O'Toole(pty:mov)) (Rohr, Barbara) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support Of, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Barbara A. Rohr, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Mon 05/15 8:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Michelle Thai's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Her Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Movant Michelle Thai. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attorney Reed R Kathrein added to party Michelle Thai(pty:mov)) (Kathrein, Reed) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Mon 05/15 6:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Movant Anderson/Schweighart Group. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attorney James Robert Noblin added to party Anderson/Schweighart Group(pty:bkmov)) (Noblin, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration James Robert Noblin, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/15 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Michelle Thai, (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 05/15 6:17 PM
DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel 19 filed by Movant Michelle Thai.(Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Wolf Popper Firm Resume, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - GPM Firm Resume | ||
20 | 20
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 05/15 6:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel 19 filed by Movant Michelle Thai. (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Mon 05/15 6:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Movant Michelle Thai. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attorney Lesley F Portnoy added to party Michelle Thai(pty:mov)) (Portnoy, Lesley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/15 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movants Sau Au, David Garner, Roberta Garner, (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 05/15 3:16 PM
DECLARATION of Laurence Rosen In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 15 filed by Movants Sau Au, David Garner, Roberta Garner.(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 05/15 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 15 filed by Movants Sau Au, David Garner, Roberta Garner. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Mon 05/15 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movants Sau Au, Roberta Garner, David Garner. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Sau Au(pty:mov), Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Roberta Garner(pty:mov), Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party David Garner(pty:mov)) (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 05/12 4:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint8 . The Court having read and considered said stipulation, hereby DENIES the stipulation for failure to show good cause. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/10 10:02 AM
ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Richard J.L. Lomuscio APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, Xiaoming Hu, Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Bing Mei, Cheng Wang, Xiaoying Zhu (, designating Ryan S. Fife as local counsel. (shb) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 05/03 3:48 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard J.L. Lomuscio to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Xiaoming Hu, Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Bing Mei, Cheng Wang, Xiaoying Zhu (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19792722) filed by Defendants Xiaoming Hu, Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Bing Mei, Cheng Wang, Xiaoying Zhu. (Fife, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificates of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 05/02 1:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini, re Order,,10 served on 5/2/2017. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 05/01 4:33 PM
STANDING ORDER. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY, IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Honorable Consuelo B Marshall. Both the Court and the attorneys bear the responsibility for the progress of litigation in this Court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. Fed.R.Civ.P.1. NON COMPLIANCE MAY LEAD TO THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS AND INCLUDING THE STRIKING OF PLEADINGS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION. (shb) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 04/28 2:29 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan S Fife counsel for Defendants Xiaoming Hu, Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Bing Mei, Cheng Wang, Xiaoying Zhu. Adding Ryan S. Fife as counsel of record for Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Xiaoming Hu, Xiaoying Zhu, Cheng Wang, Bing Mei for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., et al. (Attorney Ryan S Fife added to party Xiaoming Hu(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S Fife added to party Kandi Technologies Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S Fife added to party Bing Mei(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S Fife added to party Cheng Wang(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan S Fife added to party Xiaoying Zhu (pty:dft))(Fife, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/27 2:50 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File (1) Amended Complaint; and (2) Briefing on Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini.(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 1:03 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Xiaoming Hu, Kandi Technologies Group, Inc., Bing Mei, Cheng Wang, Xiaoying Zhu. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 12:56 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 1:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 1:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini, identifying none to report. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 1:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini. (Rosen, Laurence) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19512897 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nunziatina Paolini. (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Nunziatina Paolini(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence) |
|
Att: 1 PSLRA Certification |