(PS)(SS) Ortiz v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Referred: | Deborah Barnes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00527 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Rene Ortiz
7566 Phoenix Park Drive
Sacramento, CA 95823 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 08/07 8:20 AM
JUDGMENT dated *8/7/17* entered pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/7/17. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/07 8:19 AM
ORDER adopting in full4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/7/17. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 08/07 8:21 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,6 Judgment served on Rene Ortiz. (Kastilahn, A) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 06/23 11:49 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/22/17 RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice.Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 06/23 11:49 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Findings and Recommendations served on Rene Ortiz. (Becknal, R) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Fri 05/05 10:36 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/4/17 ORDERING that the complaint filed 3/13/2017 (ECF No.1 ) is DISMISSED with LEAVE to AMEND; Within twenty-eight days, an amended complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in this order and complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Practice; Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed(Becknal, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 05/05 10:37 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order served on Rene Ortiz. (Becknal, R) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
misc
IFP Application
Tue 03/14 2:58 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Washington, S) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 2:57 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rene Ortiz. (Washington, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Rene Ortiz.(Washington, S) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Litigant Letter |