(HC) Brown v. McDonald
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00537 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Petitioner
Ronnie O. Brown
|
|
Respondent
Jim McDonald
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
misc
Other Court Case Number
Fri 03/31 8:09 AM
OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA case number 2:17-cv-02476. (Robles, S) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - District
Mon 03/27 9:15 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/24/17 ordering the court has not ruled on petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis. CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/27/2017 (Plummer, M) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 03/27 9:15 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Ronnie O. Brown. (Plummer, M) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 03/14 2:19 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/17/2017. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/14 2:20 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ronnie O. Brown. (Kastilahn, A) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 2:19 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnie O. Brown. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/14 2:18 PM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jim McDonald, State of California by Ronnie O. Brown.(Kastilahn, A) |