Ronald Emrit v. University of Arkansas
Original Case: 5:16-cv-05326
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01540 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
United States Department of Education
|
|
Defendant
MOHELA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Southwest Student Services
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
University of Arkansas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ronald Satish Emrit
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 3:42 AM CDT |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4511693] 17-1540 (AEV) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Opinion and Order 2/13/17, docket entries, [4511715] 17-1540 (AEV) | ||
CLERK LETTER sent. Upon further review, this case will be referred to the court and a briefing schedule will not be set. [4511768] 17-1540 (AEV) |