California Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey T Miller
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:13-cv-02947
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332ss Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2013
Terminated:Nov 12, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 7:05 PM PST
Defendant
Bridgepoint Education, Inc.
Represented By
Nina F Locker
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Andrew S. Clark
Represented By
Nina F Locker
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Craig
Represented By
Nina F Locker
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Dale Crandall
Represented By
Nina F Locker
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Marye Anne Fox
Represented By
Nina F Locker
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Patrick T. Hackett
Represented By
Tariq Mundiya
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
John F Cannon
Stradling Yocca Carlson And Rauth
contact info
Sameer Advani
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert Hartman
Represented By
Nina F Locker
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich And Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Adarsh Sarma
Represented By
Tariq Mundiya
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
John F Cannon
Stradling Yocca Carlson And Rauth
contact info
Sameer Advani
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warburg Pincus & Co.
Represented By
Tariq Mundiya
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
John F Cannon
Stradling Yocca Carlson And Rauth
contact info
Sameer Advani
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warburg Pincus LLC
Represented By
Tariq Mundiya
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
John F Cannon
Stradling Yocca Carlson And Rauth
contact info
Sameer Advani
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warburg Pincus Partners LLC
Represented By
Tariq Mundiya
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
John F Cannon
Stradling Yocca Carlson And Rauth
contact info
Sameer Advani
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warburg Pincus Private Equity VIII, L.P.
Represented By
Tariq Mundiya
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
John F Cannon
Stradling Yocca Carlson And Rauth
contact info
Sameer Advani
Willkie Farr And Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon A. Craig-Johnston
Represented By
Eric L. Zagar
Barroway Topaz Kessler Meltzer & Check LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carmen Di Giovanni
Represented By
Eric L. Zagar
Barroway Topaz Kessler Meltzer & Check LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2014
TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge Stormes, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 13cv2947 JM (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 03/28/14.(jcj)
GPO Oct 17 2014
ORDER Granting Defendants' 1315 Motions to Dismiss. Defendants' motions to dismiss for failure to allege demand futility under Rule 23.1(b)(3) are Granted with Leave to Amend. Should Plaintiffs wish to file a second amended complaint, they must do so within twenty days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/17/2014. (rlu)

Docket last updated: 01/04/2017 11:59 PM PST
Monday, December 09, 2013
1 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bridgepoint Education, Inc., Andrew S. Clark, Ryan Craig, Dale Crandall, Marye Anne Fox, Patrick T. Hackett, Robert Hartman, Adarsh Sarma, Warburg Pincus & Co., Warburg Pincus LLC, Warburg Pincus Partners LLC, Warburg Pincus Private Equity VIII, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6570935) filed by Carmen Di Giovanni. The new case number is 3:13-cv-2947-H-BLM. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Zagar, Eric)(kcm) Modified on 12/9/2013 to note that a low number order was prepared; 13-CV-2645-JM-WMC (ag)(av1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet
2 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kcm)
Related: [-]