JAS INVESTMENT PROPERTIES INC.
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Gary Spraker |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-11213 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2019 |
Debtor
JAS INVESTMENT PROPERTIES INC.
2461 S Buffalo Dr
Las Vegas, NV 89117-2704 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 7
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD, SO. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 03/15/2017 12:02 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition 7
Wed 03/15 10:12 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335. Filed by JOHN R. HOLIDAY on behalf of. JAS Investment Properties Inc. (HOLIDAY, JOHN) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:29 AM
Adversary case 17-01171 Complaint Notice of Removal of Action Filed by QUAID30 LLC vs.. JAS Investment Properties Inc., Joel Molina Fee Amount $350. (01 Determination of removed claim or cause )(HOLIDAY, JOHN) Modified on 3/15/2017 to reflect corrected nature of suit (Gallagher, DA) |