Yoyo 1 LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-13082 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Debtor
Yoyo 1 LLC
10720 NW 66th St Apt 107
Doral, FL 33178-3656 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Joel L Tabas
14 NE 1 Ave PH
Miami, FL 33132 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 03/16/2017 12:04 AM EDT |