Rabren v. Harleysville Life Insurance Company et al (MAG2)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00147 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
Custom Disability Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harleysville Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Rabren
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Fri 07/14 9:15 AM
JUDGMENT: Upon consideration of plaintiffs notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice (doc. no. 17 ), which the court construes as a motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), it is ORDERED that the motion to dismiss is granted, and this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/14/2017. (term: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018;Non-Jury Trial set for 11/19/2018) (furn: ag, calendar)(kh, ) (kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 (7/14/2017) Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/13 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charlene Rabren (Fuller, James) |
|
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/14 9:11 AM
MOTION to Dismiss construed in the18 Judgment by Charlene Rabren. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry17 for pdf)(kh, ) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/12 12:51 PM
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018, in Mongtomery, AL, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Non-Jury Trial set for 11/19/2018, in Mongtomery, AL, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 4/13/2018; Mediation Notice due by 3/21/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2017; Discovery due by 3/14/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/12/2017. (furn: calendar, ag) (wcl, ) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/12 10:10 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Charles S. Coody for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/12/2017. (wcl, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 05/09 11:25 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, ) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/08 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Andrew Hosp on behalf of Custom Disability Solutions (Hosp, Edward) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 05/08 3:06 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wahlheim, William) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/24 11:56 AM
RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/8/2017; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached consent or reassignment form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/8/2017; DO NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/24/2017. (wcl, ) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/20 2:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Custom Disability Solutions.(Wahlheim, William) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/20 1:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Harleysville Life Insurance Company.(Long, Felicia) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 03/21 1:25 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/21/2017. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/21 10:38 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Custom Disability Solutions, Harleysville Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 4:54 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charlene Rabren. (Fuller, James) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 4:05 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Custom Disability Solutions re4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Wahlheim, William) Modified on 3/16/2017 to add the link to the4 notice (wcl, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Thu 03/16 2:07 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Custom Disability Solutions; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/27/2017.(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/16 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Custom Disability Solutions, Harleysville Life Insurance Company, Charlene Rabren (ALL PARTIES). (wcl, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 1:44 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harleysville Life Insurance Company. (Long, Felicia) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Custom Disability Solutions, Harleysville Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-17-900206.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602044575)(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing to State Court, | ||
Att: 4 Receipt | ||
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Custom Disability Solutions, Harleysville Life Insurance Company, filed by Charlene Rabren. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc2 for pdf)(wcl, ) |
||
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Custom Disability Solutions, Harleysville Life Insurance Company re: filing of2 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc2 for pdf) (wcl, ) |