Berthelot, et al v. Andreas Fahl Medizintechnik-Vertrieb GmbH
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ivan Lr Lemelle |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02140 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 3:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Andreas Fahl Medizintechnik-Vertrieb GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean M. Berthelot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon D. Berthelot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LaVon P. Berthelot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean H. Berthelot
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
60 | 60
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/17 11:27 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the59 motion is GRANTED. The Court entered an order dismissing the case without prejudice after being advised that the parties had firmly agreed upon a compromise. Rec. Doc. 58. Plaintiffs now ask that the matter be dismissed with prejudice. Rec. Doc. 59. Accordingly, all claims in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 4/17/2018. (jls) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
59 | 59
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/16 11:04 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Dean M. Berthelot, Jon D. Berthelot, LaVon P. Berthelot, Sean H. Berthelot.(Warshauer, Irving) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |