Soto-Bustillos v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00752 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sam's Stores #8282
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sam's West Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bertha Soto-Bustillos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/11 2:32 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of Defendants by Sam's Stores #8282, Sam's West Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores LLC. (Martinez, Ramona) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 07/11 2:57 PM
Civil Case Terminated per5 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ran) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Status Report Order
Fri 04/21 3:58 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Attorney conference shall take place no later than 5/8/2017. Joint Status Report due by 5/23/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/21/2017) (sss) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Lindsay
Wed 03/15 2:28 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 12:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sam's Stores #8282, Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, LLC. (Martinez, Ramona) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 5, Dallas County, case number CC 16-05777 E filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Sam's West Inc, Sam's Stores #8282, Wal-Mart Stores LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8277126) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Martinez, Ramona) Modified on 3/15/2017 (aaa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, | ||
Att: 5 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Cover Sheet Supplement |