Campbell v. Stephen
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert A Junell |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00013 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Thu 04/12 3:23 PM
JUDGMENT/MANDATE Denied. His motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis likewise is DENIED. (ab1) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Thu 10/12 4:38 PM
Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site. Instructions on the use of the EROA downloads page can be found at www.ca5.uscourts.gov/attorneys/attorney-forms/eroa_downloads (ab1) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
Fri 10/06 9:54 AM
ORDER DENYING12 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (mb1) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis on APPEAL
Thu 10/05 10:41 AM
MOTION to proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal by Joel L. Campbell. (mb1) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 09/21 7:24 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Will Chambers on behalf of Lorie Davis - Director of the TDCJ-Correctional Institutions Division (Chambers, Will) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 09/11 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Joel L. Campbell. no fee submitted nor a motion informa pauperis Filing fee $ 505. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out[LINK:Form DKT-13] (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (mb1) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside
Thu 08/31 10:03 AM
ORDER DENYING8 Motion to Set Aside Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (mb1) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Set Aside
Wed 08/30 4:30 PM
MOTION to Set Aside by Joel L. Campbell. (mb1) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/09 10:12 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (mb1) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 08/09 10:08 AM
ORDERED that the Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus [Docket Entry1], filed February 9, 2017, is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (mb1) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Response
Fri 06/30 1:56 PM
RESPONSE to answer by Joel L. Campbell. (mb1) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
State Court Records
Wed 06/21 12:08 PM
State Court Records Filed.(Chambers, Will) |
|
Att: 1 Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 Order, | ||
Att: 3 Mtn for Rehearing, | ||
Att: 4 Appellant's Brief, | ||
Att: 5 Appellee's Brief, | ||
Att: 6 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 7 Clerk's Record, | ||
Att: 8 WR-34,564-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 6 30-1997 | ||
Att: 9 WR-34,564-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 7 13-2016 | ||
Att: 10 WR-34,564-02 STATUS WRIT 1 20-2017 | ||
Att: 11 WR-34,564-02 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 6-13-2016 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Wed 06/21 11:57 AM
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Lorie Davis - Director of the TDCJ-Correctional Institutions Division.(Chambers, Will) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Tue 03/21 7:13 AM
ORDER re1 DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE HIS ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joel L. Campbell, Respondent's Answer: Respondent shall file his answer no later than June 21,2017.. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (mb1) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Wed 03/15 11:04 AM
Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt 400005129 (dm2) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number paid), filed by Joel Campbell.(mb1) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-6 |