Patricia Osorio et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02063 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Osorio
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 05/24 12:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE11 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The Court hereby orders that: (1) The entire action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. (2) Each of the parties shall bear their own fees and costs for this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 05/22 12:37 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Section 41(a)(1) filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.(Willis, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Action With Prejudice | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 04/19 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Willis, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Joshua N. Willis, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order to Dismiss Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order to Dismiss Portions of Complaint | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 03/21 12:16 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Allstate Insurance Company answer now due 4/21/2017, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.(Willis, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 9:17 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/15 1:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 3/15/2017. (Willis, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 1:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Willis, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, identifying The Allstate Corporation. (Willis, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 1:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Willis, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number VC065925 Receipt No: 0973-19519754 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attorney Joshua N Willis added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Willis, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- State Court File, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Request for Stmt of Damages, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F- Statement of Damages, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Real Estate Records, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H- Allstate Corp Records, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I- Kuebler case | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 2:50 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Does 1 through 50., filed by plaintiff Patricia Osorio. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/10/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:53 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Does amending Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Patricia Osorio. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/9/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A)(ghap) Modified on 3/16/2017 (ghap) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/16 2:59 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Patricia Osorio, upon Defendant Allstate Insurance Company served on 1/23/2017, answer due 2/13/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gladys Aguilera, Person Authorize to Accept, Age:35, Weight 170 Hair Black, Sex: Female, Height 5'7, Race Hispanic in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/17/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) |