(PS) Bird v. Guarino
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Referred: | Craig M Kellison |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00554 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 1:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jennifer Guarino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald M. Bird
P.O. Box 5313
Corning, CA 96021 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Wed 12/06 10:08 AM
JUDGMENT dated *12/6/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/4/2017. (Zignago, K.) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 12/06 10:08 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/4/2017 ADOPTING10 findings and recommendations in full. Defendant's4 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED without leave to amend. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 12/06 10:09 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:13 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and14 Judgment served on Donald M. Bird. (Zignago, K.) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Substitution of Attorney Order
Wed 11/29 9:39 AM
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/28/17. Attorney Steven D. Roland ADDED for Jennifer Guarino. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 11/29 9:42 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:12 Substitution of Attorney Order served on Donald M. Bird. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Substitution of Attorney - Proposed
Tue 11/14 1:39 PM
SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Jennifer Guarino. (Roland, Steven) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 10/26 9:51 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/26/2017 RECOMMENDING that defendant's4 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Plaintiff's1 Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. The Clerk of Court be directed to enter judgment and close this case. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 10/26 9:51 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Findings and Recommendations served on Donald M. Bird. (Zignago, K.) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 10/19 1:03 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/19/2017 GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Hunt, G) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 10/19 1:04 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Order served on Donald M. Bird. (Hunt, G) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 08/09 10:43 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison: MOTION HEARING held on 8/9/2017. Motion [Doc. 4] taken under submission. Plaintiff Donald Bird, Pro Se present. Defendants Counsel Kara DiBiasio present. (Pine, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 08/09 10:44 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Motion Hearing served on Donald M. Bird. (Pine, C) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 08/02 2:00 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal of Complaint re4 MOTION to DISMISS,6 Reply by Jennifer Guarino. (Dibiasio, Kara) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Reply
Wed 08/02 1:54 PM
REPLY by Jennifer Guarino re4 MOTION to DISMISS. (Dibiasio, Kara) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Opposition to Motion
Wed 07/05 11:23 AM
OPPOSITION by Donald M. Bird to4 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Mon 05/22 3:42 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Jennifer Guarino. Attorney Dibiasio, Kara Louise added. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Dibiasio, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/27 7:47 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re1 Complaint by Donald M. Bird. (Michel, G.) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 10:05 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donald M. Bird. (Kaminski, H) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer Guarino by Donald M. Bird.(Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |