|
GPO
Mar 16 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/16/17 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Benson, A)
|
|
GPO
Sep 21 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/17, ORDERING that Defendant shall have a two-week extension of time to 10/4/2017 to respond to Plaintiff's opening brief.(Kastilahn, A)
|
|
GPO
Sep 18 2018
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/17/2018 DENYING 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
|