Rodriguez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00509 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Welk Resort Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alma Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 01/23 11:25 AM
ORDER granting23 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/23/2018. (anh) (sjt) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/10 7:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Alma Rodriguez. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 01/08 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jared M. Hartman (Hartman, Jared) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Wed 12/20 11:25 AM
ORDER Granting Joint20 Motion to Dismiss Welk Resort Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/19/17. (dlg) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Party
Tue 12/12 3:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Welk Resort Group by Alma Rodriguez.(Hartman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 12/01 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant WELK RESORT GROUP, INC. by Alma Rodriguez(Hartman, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/20 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R Fuller on behalf of Welk Resort Group, Inc. (Fuller, Chad)Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party Welk Resort Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Main Document 18 replaced to flatten image on 11/20/2017) (knb) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Fri 11/17 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: In light of the stay entered 5/22/2017 as to one defendant and the Notice of Settlement filed recently as to the other defendant, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference has been taken off calendar. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference has been set for 2/23/2018 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephonic conference by calling Judge Crawford's chambers with all counsel on the line. The Court will vacate the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before 2/23/2018.(no document attached) (plh) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 11/16 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Between Plaintiff and Experian by Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Martin, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
5
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Wed 10/11 3:36 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/20/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/11/2017.(jpp) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/18 2:40 PM
STATUS REPORT re: Arbitration by Welk Resort Group, Inc.. (Steinbacher, Taylor) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 05/22 10:08 AM
ORDER Staying Action as to Defendant Welk Resort Group, Inc. Pending Arbitration re12 Motion to Stay. Case stayed during the pendency of the parties' arbitration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/18/2017. (fth) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stay
Mon 05/08 8:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Action as to Defendant Welk Resort Group Pending Arbitration by Welk Resort Group, Inc.. (Steinbacher, Taylor) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/13 1:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Welk Resort Group, Inc. re9 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Scott M. Pearson (Pearson, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Wed 04/12 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Martin, Gregory) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/12 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Scott M. Pearson on behalf of Welk Resort Group, Inc. (Pearson, Scott)Attorney Scott M. Pearson added to party Welk Resort Group, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/11 6:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Martin, Gregory)Attorney Gregory S. Martin added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc(pty:dft) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/11 9:44 AM
ORDER granting6 Joint Motion to Extend Defendant Welk Resort Group, Inc.'s Time to Respond. Welk's time to respond is extended to 5/11/2017. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/10/2017. (fth) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/07 7:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Welk Resort Group, Inc.. (Steinbacher, Taylor)Attorney Taylor Steinbacher added to party Welk Resort Group, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alma Rodriguez. Welk Resort Group, Inc. served. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 03/23 2:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alma Rodriguez. Experian Information Solutions, Inc served. (Hartman, Jared) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Babak Semnar on behalf of Alma Rodriguez (Semnar, Babak)Attorney Babak Semnar added to party Alma Rodriguez(pty:pla) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 10:21 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9897953.), filed by Alma Rodriguez. The new case number is 3:17-cv-509-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hartman, Jared)(mpl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |