Cynthia Herndon, et al v. Indiana Department of Child S, et al
Original Case: 1:17-cv-00025
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01550 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 16, 2017 3:36 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SERVICES
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEBRA BANGHART
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ST. JOSEPH COUNTY, INDIANA
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
SOUTH BEND COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CYNTHIA M. HERNDON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LARRY ORUTA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2017 3:28 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Cynthia M. Herndon and Larry Oruta by 03/21/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 03/29/2017. [1] [6825924] 17-1550 (CAG) | |
2 | 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6826057] 17-1550 (CAG) |