New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan S Trust
Case #: 8:13-bk-76177
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Feb 07, 2014
Terminated:Oct 16, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Feb 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pier-Tech Inc.
7 Hampton Rd
Oceanside, NY 11572-4808
Represented By
Jordan Pilevsky
Lamonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP
contact info
Salvatore LaMonica
Lamonica Herbst And Maniscalco
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, July 28, 2016
244 244 misc Declaration Thu 07/28 11:06 AM
Declaration Filed by Marc A Tenenbaum on behalf of New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship Journeyman Retraining, Educational, and Industry Fund Related [+] (Tenenbaum, Marc)
Related: [-] 242 Generic Order
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Default Notice)
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
243 243 misc Affidavit Wed 07/27 1:33 PM
Affidavit Re: Delinquent Payment by Debtor under the Second Amended Plan Filed by Danny P Cerrone on behalf of Equipment Corporation of America, TJMinc, LLC Related [+] (Cerrone, Danny)
Related: [-] 242 Generic Order