Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott H Gan
Case #: 4:17-bk-02482
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Apr 25, 2017
Terminated:Jun 10, 2019
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jun 26, 2017

Debtor
PIMA BOATS LLC dba CATALINA MARINA
2020 W Gardner Ln
Tucson, AZ 85705-2208
Represented By
CHERYL K COPPERSTONE
Law Office Of Cheryl K Copperstone
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
STANLEY J KARTCHNER
7090 N ORACLE RD #178-204
TUCSON, AZ 85704
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 03/16/2017 12:03 PM MST
Thursday, March 16, 2017
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 03/16 10:24 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(4:17-bk-02482) [other,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28108076. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs other 1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee) Thu 03/16 10:21 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 04/6/2017, Master Mailing due 03/23/2017, Schedules A/B-J due 03/30/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/30/2017, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 03/30/2017, Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income Due by 03/30/2017, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 03/30/2017, filed by CHERYL K COPPERSTONE of LAW OFFICE OF CHERYL K COPPERSTONE on behalf of PIMA BOATS LLC dba CATALINA MARINA (COPPERSTONE, CHERYL)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) Thu 03/16 10:21 AM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 10:30 AM at U.S. Trustee Meeting Room, James A. Walsh Court, 38 S Scott Ave, St 140, Tucson, AZ (341-TUC). Complaints objecting to discharge due by 06/26/2017. (COPPERSTONE, CHERYL)
Related: [-]