SEMBEGUYA v. BICKHAM
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Hugh Lawson |
Referred: | Stephen Hyles |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00046 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 5:08 AM EDT |
Notice
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
|
|
Petitioner
DAVID S SEMBEGUYA
No. 40750 STEWART DETENTION CENTER PO BOX 248
LUMPKIN, GA 31815 |
|
Respondent
WARDEN BICKHAM
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 06/21 9:12 AM
Mail Returned -14 Judgment,13 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Report and Recommendations sent to David S. Sembeguya returned as undeliverable. (sbd) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Wed 06/07 4:13 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing this case. (rlw) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/07 3:01 PM
ORDER adopting11 Report and Recommendations; granting10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 6/7/2017. (aks) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 06/06 9:51 AM
Mail Returned -11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BICKHAM,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DAVID S SEMBEGUYA sent to David S. Sembeguya returned as undeliverable. (rlw) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 05/19 2:02 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BICKHAM,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DAVID S SEMBEGUYA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5/19/17. (AGH) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 05/19 1:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BICKHAM filed by LAUREN E FASCETT.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(FASCETT, LAUREN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Warrant of Removal | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 05/18 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAUREN E FASCETT on behalf of BICKHAM Attorney LAUREN E FASCETT added to party BICKHAM(pty:res) (FASCETT, LAUREN) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 04/06 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID S SEMBEGUYA. (rlw) (rlw) |
|
Att: 1 (4/6/2017) Envelope | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/03 9:13 AM
Mail Returned - 5 Order,4 Order for Response (Habeas Petition) sent to David Sembeguya returned as undeliverable. (rlw) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/28 9:55 AM
Mail Returned -2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,3 Consent to Proceed Form Sent sent to David S. Sembeguya returned as undeliverable. (rlw) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 03/22 2:35 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER re4 Order for Response (Habeas Petition). Due to a scrivener's error, the date in the4 Order for Response is incorrect. The4 Order for Response was filed and signed today, March 22, 2017. All deadlines contained therein shall run from March 22, 2017. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/22/17. (AGH) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order for Response (Habeas Petition)
Wed 03/22 11:38 AM
ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DAVID S SEMBEGUYA. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/22/17. (AGH) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Thu 03/16 9:35 AM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DAVID S SEMBEGUYA. (rlw) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/16 9:34 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Stephen Hyles issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 03/16 9:33 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by DAVID S SEMBEGUYA. (Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number 41651)(rlw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B - Notice to Alien of File Custody Review, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Decision to Continue Detention, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |