Zapala v. Buncich et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul R Cherry |
Referred: | Paul R Cherry |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00118 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Michael Buehrle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 3
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
N Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J Kraus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Zapala
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Buncich
Terminated: 05/26/2017
individually, as Sheriff of Lake County Lake County Sheriff 2293 North Main St.
Crown Point, IN 46307 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
Terminated: 04/04/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
Terminated: 04/04/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 4
Terminated: 04/04/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/09 1:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, costs paid, pursuant to the Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal (DE 31). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/9/18. (ksp) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Thu 10/04 11:56 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Mark Zapala. (Weigle, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/25 3:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry no longer assigned to case. (mr) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/25 3:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. Senior Judge James T Moody no longer assigned to case. (mr) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 10/24 4:04 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Weigle, David) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Wed 10/11 2:10 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (mr) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/11 2:10 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: The26 Motion for Hearing is granted. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2017 at 3:15 PM Eastern time (2:15 PM Central time) before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Court to initiate conference. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 10/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/11/2017. (mr) (mr) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Hearing
Tue 10/10 12:54 PM
MOTION for Hearing Setting Matter for Preliminary Telephonic PreTrial Conference by Plaintiff Mark Zapala. (Weigle, David) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Fri 05/26 1:29 PM
CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to John Buncich, individually, as Sheriff of Lake County and Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department only. (efc) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 05/22 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Zapala (Weigle, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/03 10:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time finding good cause shown and noting the lack of objection. Pla's deadline to file a response to20 Motion to Dismiss is extended to 5/22/2017. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/3/2017. (mr) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/02 2:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Mark Zapala. (Weigle, David) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 9:55 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge James T Moody for all further proceedings. Judge William C Lee no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2017. (lns) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 04/24 5:35 PM
BRIEF in Support of20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department, John Buncich. (Bushemi, John) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/24 5:34 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants John Buncich, Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department. (Bushemi, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 04/18 12:08 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by Michael Buehrle, John Doe 3, N Fisher, J Kraus, Officer Simmons.(McCloskey, Casey) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/18 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Casey J McCloskey on behalf of N Fisher, J Kraus (McCloskey, Casey) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 04/06 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's13 Amended Complaint by Defendants John Buncich, Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department. The Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (DE13 ) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff Mark Zapala GRANTED LEAVE to refile the stricken pleading with the required signature and Court notes that Plaintiff has done so at Docket Entry 16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/6/17. (cer) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/05 10:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT re-filed with signature against All Defendants, filed by Mark Zapala.(Weigle, David) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/05 5:03 PM
MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re13 Amended Complaint by Defendants John Buncich, Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department. (Bushemi, John) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/05 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to N Fisher, J Kraus. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/04 4:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Zapala.(Weigle, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Fisher, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Kraus | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/31 10:54 AM
Reset Deadlines: Answer date reset to 4/7/17 for defendants Michael Buehrle, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, ___________ Simmons w/t/c/n/u (jld) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
State Court Record Received
Mon 03/27 4:06 PM
STATE COURT DOCKET RECEIVED; State Court Case No. 45D04-1702-CT-00032. (jss) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
Wed 03/22 1:24 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Michael Buehrle, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, ___________ Simmons w/t/c/n/u ; answer due by April 7, 2017. (McCloskey, Casey) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
Wed 03/22 11:43 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 4/12/2017. (smb) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 03/22 11:42 AM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 3/22/2017. (smb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/21 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Casey J McCloskey on behalf of Michael Buehrle, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, ___________ Simmons w/t/c/n/u (McCloskey, Casey) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/21 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David W Weigle on behalf of Mark Zapala (Weigle, David) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 03/20 2:20 PM
BRIEF in Support of5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department, John Buncich. (Bushemi, John) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 03/20 2:18 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants John Buncich, Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department. (Bushemi, John) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Estrada on behalf of John Buncich, Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department (Estrada, Alfredo) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John P Bushemi on behalf of John Buncich, Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department (Bushemi, John) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3196941.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D04-1702-CT-00032, filed by Lake County Indiana Sheriff's Department, John Buncich.(Bushemi, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/16 4:29 PM
Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. *NEW CASE* (jss) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
State Court Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:30 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mark Zapala.(jss) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |