Restricted Filer Pannell v. Anton et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon E Deguilio |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00220 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 5:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Julie Anton
|
|
Defendant
David Miller
|
|
Defendant
Carl Tibbles
|
|
Plaintiff
David Pannell
963265 Indiana State Prison One Park Row
Michigan City, IN 46360 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Janice Anton
Terminated: 04/03/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mr. Miller
Terminated: 04/03/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mr. Tibbles
Terminated: 04/03/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Tue 07/14 3:42 PM
Letter to David Pannell in response to his request for docket sheet DE17 (mailed to Pannell at CIC) (nae) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/14 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Pannell from Indiana State Prison to Pendleton CIC per Letter DE17 (nae) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Tue 07/14 3:28 PM
Letter from David Pannell requesting copy of docket sheet (nae) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Clerks Judgment
Mon 05/08 12:04 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (cc: Plaintiff) (lhc) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Opinion and Order Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/08 12:03 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DISMISSES without prejudice the claim against Janice Anton; DISMISSES with prejudice the remaining claims; and DIRECTS the clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/8/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 9:12 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon E DeGuilio for all further proceedings. Senior Judge James T Moody no longer assigned to case. ( Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017). Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (kjp) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 04/06 1:53 PM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's 1983 Civil Rights Complaint by Defendants Janice Anton, Mr Miller; DENYING AS MOOT6 MOTION to Amend "1983 Civil Complaint" by Interdelineation to Correct the Names of Each Defendant Sued in This "1983 Civil Complaint" re5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff David Pannell; DENYING AS MOOT8 MOTION to Direct Clerk of the Court to Issue Service of Summon and Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1448 by Plaintiff David Pannell. This case is STAYED pending the Court's screening of the Amended Complaint. All deadlines in this case are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/6/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (cer) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 04/04 3:57 PM
Letter from David Pannell requesting copy of docket sheet. (sent) (jld) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 04/04 3:56 PM
Plaintiff's Objection to Motion re3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's 1983 Civil Rights Complaint filed by David Pannell. (jld) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/04 3:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Julie Anton, David Miller, Carl Tibbles, filed by David Pannell.(jld) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons & USM-285 forms for Defendant Tibbles only, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/04 3:45 PM
MOTION to Direct Clerk of the Court to Issue Service of Summon and Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1448 by Plaintiff David Pannell. (jld) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Receipt
Tue 04/04 3:42 PM
RECEIPT from David Pannell of USM-285 form for Carl Tibbles. (jld) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 03/28 2:59 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend "1983 Civil Complaint" by Interdelineation to Correct the Names of Each Defendant Sued in This "1983 Civil Complaint" re:5 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff David Pannell.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Reagan Gastineau on behalf of Janice Anton, Mr Miller (Gastineau, Jessica) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/16 11:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's 1983 Civil Rights Complaint by Defendants Janice Anton, Mr Miller. (Legge, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/16 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Legge on behalf of Janice Anton, Mr Miller (Legge, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/16 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3196367.), filed by Mr Miller, Janice Anton.(Legge, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Filings | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/16 2:41 PM
Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (nal) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
State Court Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:45 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in La Porte Superior Court against Janice Anton, Mr. Miller, Mr. Tibbles by David Pannell. (nal) |