Bestgen et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Howard F Sachs |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00191 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
420 Montgomery St.
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Lee Bestgen
4452 S.W. Raintree Shore Dr.
Lee's Summit, MO 64082 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Andrew Bestgen
4452 S.W. Raintree Shore Dr.
Lee's Summit, MO 64082 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Terminated: 06/19/2017
221 Bolivar Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 05/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 11/06 1:23 PM
Order of Dismissal with prejudice against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed on 11/6/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/06 8:34 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. by Cindy Lee Bestgen, Louis Andrew Bestgen. (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 07/26 12:23 PM
NOTICE of settlement WITH WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ONLY by Cindy Lee Bestgen, Louis Andrew Bestgen (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 4:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Please see order for additional deadlines. Signed on 6/21/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 11:30 AM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER With Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Cindy Lee Bestgen, Louis Andrew Bestgen. (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 06/19 4:39 PM
Order of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC only. Signed on 6/19/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 05/30 12:51 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO TRANS UNION, LLC ONLY by Cindy Lee Bestgen, Louis Andrew Bestgen. (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/24 1:03 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Rule 16 Notice
Tue 05/23 2:07 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/30/2017. Signed on 5/23/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Diefenbach, Tracy) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Thu 05/11 5:29 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jehan Kamil Moore on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Moore, Jehan) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/09 10:48 AM
Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Moore, Jehan) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Reissued
Wed 05/03 4:46 PM
SUMMONS REISSUED as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Clerk's Order of Dismissal
Tue 05/02 6:44 PM
Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL is to Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. only. (Diefenbach, Tracy) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 05/01 5:40 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Cindy Lee Bestgen, Louis Andrew Bestgen (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 05/01 4:15 PM
NOTICE of settlement WITH TRANS UNION, LLC ONLY by Cindy Lee Bestgen, Louis Andrew Bestgen (Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/11 2:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Trans Union, LLC.(Brown, Terri) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/10 2:59 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer. 30-day extension is granted as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Answer due by 5/11/2017. Signed on 4/10/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/10 12:48 PM
ORDER granting9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Terri R Brown for Trans Union, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed [LINK:ECF Registration Form] to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/07 3:32 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer unopposed filed by Jehan Kamil Moore on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/21/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jehan Kamil Moore added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Moore, Jehan) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Wed 04/05 2:59 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC.(Lubben, Todd) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/05 2:37 PM
Motion to allow Terri R. Brown to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5241962) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Lubben, Todd) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/05 2:34 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd) |
|
7 | 7
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Wed 04/05 11:02 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Louis Andrew Bestgen, Cindy Lee Bestgen. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of MAP | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Wed 04/05 10:58 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Louis Andrew Bestgen, Cindy Lee Bestgen. Trans Union, LLC served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of MAP | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/04 12:08 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Systems, Inc. answer due 5/10/2017. Signed on 4/4/17 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Diefenbach, Tracy) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/03 3:03 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint, filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Systems, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/17/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian Information Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Complaint Executed
Thu 03/23 8:16 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Louis Andrew Bestgen, Cindy Lee Bestgen. Experian Information Systems, Inc. served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of MAP | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPN
Fri 03/17 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:12 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Systems, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/16 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Experian Information Systems, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Chelsea S. Herring Springer on behalf of Louis Andrew Bestgen, Cindy Lee Bestgen. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5216098. Service due by 6/14/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Herring Springer, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - G, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |