Mainoo et al v. Comerica Bank
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00232 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:02 AM CDT |
Appellant
Emmanuel Mainoo
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Comerica Bank
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
Case Admin Sup
|
GPO
Jun 22 2017
Memorandum Opinion and Order...The order from which the above-captioned appeal is taken is affirmed. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/22/2017) (wrb) |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Thu 06/22 4:33 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT..The order from which the appeal is taken is affirmed. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/22/2017) (wrb) |
|
7 | 7
8
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 06/22 4:27 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order...The order from which the above-captioned appeal is taken is affirmed. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/22/2017) (wrb) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Appellants Reply Brief
Mon 06/12 9:47 AM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF on Appeal from an Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas The Honorable Mark X Mullin by Emmanuel Mainoo. (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellees Brief
Tue 06/06 11:33 AM
Appellee's BRIEF by Comerica Bank. (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
appeal
Appellants Brief
Tue 05/23 10:11 AM
Appellant's Opening BRIEF on Appeal from an Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas The Honorable Mark X. Mullin by Emmanuel Mainoo. (wrb) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
appeal
Notice Transmitting BK Appeal/ROA or Withdrawal of Reference
Wed 05/10 10:43 AM
Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for bankruptcy case number 13-41095 mxm13. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See District Court Local Bankruptcy Rules 8009.1 and 8006.6 and the Notice Regarding Application of Certain Local Bankruptcy Rules for information on briefing times and record requests. (Rueter - BK, Karyn) |
|
Att: 1 Mini Record, | ||
Att: 2 Appellant Record | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Thu 03/16 5:08 PM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/16/2017) (wrb) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Notice Transmitting BK Appeal/ROA or Withdrawal of Reference
Thu 03/16 2:56 PM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted notice of the appeal filed in bankruptcy case number 13-41095 mxm13 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:17-cv-232. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Rueter - BK, Karyn) |
|
qcref
McBryde
Thu 03/16 5:06 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. (wrb) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/16 5:08 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. cy to atty Thu Mar 16 17:08:36 CDT 2017 (crt) |