Armando Briceno v. CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Manuel L Real |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02113 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Armando Briceno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/26 4:46 PM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The parties are hereby notified that the Text Only Scheduling Order (Dckt. No. 13 ) was issued in error, and should be disregarded. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) |
|
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/26 4:41 PM
TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Joint Motion of the Parties to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Northern Didstrict of California, San Francisco Division 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) (Dckt. No.9 ) set for hearing on May 1, 2017 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of May 1, 2017 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Fri 04/21 8:34 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 4:17-cv-02147 filed 4/19/2017. (lom) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Transfer Case
Mon 04/17 11:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION OF THE PARTIES TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Joint Motion and Stipulation9 , this action shall be, and hereby is, transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, and this Court shall have no further jurisdiction over this matter once the transfer has been completed. All other matters on calendar in this action shall be vacated, and transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for further action. Counsel for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. shall provide notice to the Court when the transfer of this action has been completed. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (gk) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Continue
Fri 04/07 2:44 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss All Causes of Action or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Certain Portions of the Complaint from May 1, 2017 to June 5, 2017 filed by defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc..(Allderdice, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss All Causes of Action, etc | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Transfer Case
Fri 03/31 4:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc..(Allderdice, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Transfer Action, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A of Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B of Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C of Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D of Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 7 [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Motion to Transfer | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 03/23 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Causes of Action or, Alternatively Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint filed by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Allderdice, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss All Causes of Action, etc., | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss All Causes of Action, etc | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 12:31 PM
NOTICE filed by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Allderdice, Linda) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with 27 U.S.C. Section 1446(D); and Service of Standing Orders of Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc..(Allderdice, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 1:25 PM
ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 4:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. identifying CSX Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Allderdice, Linda) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC649895 Receipt No: 0973-19529280 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attorney Linda A Allderdice added to party CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.(pty:dft))(Allderdice, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration Linda Auerbach Allderdice, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Joann Wallace, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration Robert Grant | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 12:33 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Armando Briceno. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/8/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2) (ghap) |