Matthew Verdiglione v. Karen Neishi et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00469 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cypress Florist
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Karen Neishi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Verdiglione
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 06/05 11:26 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione.(Cornell, Ross) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/08 12:10 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been settled by a Notice of Settlement18 , here by orders this action dismissed without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Settlement
Fri 05/05 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/18 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Karen Neishi, identifying Matthew Verdiglione, Cypress Florist, Karen Neishi, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Crisler, Ted) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 04/14 4:03 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer14 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. However, counsel must consult the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies15 and file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than **April 18, 2017.** Failure to do so may result in the Answer being STRICKEN. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 04/14 12:19 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)14 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/13 9:22 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 First Amended Answer filed by Defendant Karen Neishi.(Crisler, Ted) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 04/11 1:44 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cypress Florist answer now due 5/9/2017, filed by Defendant Cypress Florist.(Attorney Larry Scott Karlin added to party Cypress Florist(pty:dft))(Karlin, Larry) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 04/07 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 23, 2017. (mku) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/07 8:28 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Karen Neishi.(Attorney Ted Russell Crisler added to party Karen Neishi(pty:dft))(Crisler, Ted) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Notice of Interested Parties | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 4:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Cypress Florist served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Neishi, Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 4:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Karen Neishi served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Neishi, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 1:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Cypress Florist, Karen Neishi. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 1:15 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:17-cv-00469-CJC (JDEx). (et) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, (Cornell, Ross) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19519610 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Matthew Verdiglione(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross) |