Orange County Coastkeeper v. Bristol Industries, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00471 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 33:1319 Clean Water Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bristol Industries, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orange County Coastkeeper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 06/23 10:13 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah J Spinuzzi counsel for Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. Adding Sarah J. Spinuzzi as counsel of record for Orange County Coastkeeper for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attorney Sarah J Spinuzzi added to party Orange County Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Spinuzzi, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
attorney
Change of Address
Thu 03/28 7:30 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Douglas Jonathan Chermak attorney for Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. Changing attorneys address to 1939 Harrison Street, Suite 150 Oakland, CA 94612. Filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
judgmentCV
Judgment - Consent
Fri 12/29 11:53 PM
CONSENT DECREE by Judge James V. Selna ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (mt) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Judgment
Fri 12/22 1:09 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Proposed Consent Decree filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper.(Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
notice
Non-Opposition to Document (not a motion)
Fri 12/22 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION Stipulation to Stay Case22 filed by Interested Party USDOJ. Notice of Non-Opposition to Consent Decree(Mackay, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report
Mon 12/11 5:03 PM
STATUS REPORT of RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BY DOJ filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 11/17 12:10 PM
ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all existing deadlines and obligations in this matter shall be vacated. The Court hereby sets January 16, 2018, as the deadline for the filing of a Request for Entry of the Proposed Consent Decree, or a Notice that the settlement is null and void.22 (es) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Stay Case
Thu 11/16 4:34 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Review of Proposed Consent Decree by Department of Justice filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper.(Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 10/13 11:45 AM
Amended STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/13/2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Bristol Industries, LLC.(Chang, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 10/10 4:42 PM
ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference19 . The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna.) (twdb) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Continue
Mon 10/09 11:30 AM
Third STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference from 10/16/17 to 11/27/17 filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper.(Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend Time to File Answer
Tue 09/12 12:27 PM
Joint REQUEST to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/13/2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Bristol Industries, LLC. (Chang, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/05 2:23 PM
ORDER to Reschedule Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference16 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference scheduled forSeptember 11, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., is continued to October 16, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall disclose information andconfer on a discovery plan not later than twenty-one (21) days prior to the scheduling conference and file a report with the Court entitled Joint Rule 26(f) Report not later than fourteen (14) days after they confer. (lwag) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Reschedule
Fri 09/01 12:46 PM
Second STIPULATION to Reschedule Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper.(Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 08/10 1:11 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bristol Industries, LLC answer now due 9/13/2017, filed by Defendant Bristol Industries, LLC.(Chang, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 07/05 1:38 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance12 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 07/05 12:29 PM
ORDER TO RESCHEDULE RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference is continued to September 11, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than twenty-one (21) days prior to the scheduling conference and file a report with the Court entitled Joint Rule 26(f) Report not later than fourteen (14) days after they confer. (es) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Wed 07/05 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric Chang on behalf of Defendant Bristol Industries, LLC (Attorney Eric Chang added to party Bristol Industries, LLC(pty:dft))(Chang, Eric) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Reschedule
Fri 06/30 3:44 PM
STIPULATION to Reschedule Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper.(Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/13 12:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. upon Bristol Industries, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/13/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Timothy J. Bergere. (Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/13 3:29 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/3/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 04/13 11:16 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 11:05 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Bristol Industries, LLC. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:51 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 3:56 PM
NOTICE filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. Notice of Interested Parties (Chermak, Douglas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 3:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 3:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19528506 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attorney Douglas Jonathan Chermak added to party Orange County Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Chermak, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to complaint |