Denise Menichiello v. Elite Home Energy, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00472 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Elite Home Energy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Denise Menichiello
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 04/06 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Denise Menichiello. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/29 1:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Elite Home Energy, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 3:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Denise Menichiello. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Denise Menichiello, (Friedman, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Denise Menichiello. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19528872 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Denise Menichiello. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Denise Menichiello(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) |