Donna K Hickman v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Gail J Standish |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00475 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 06/06 1:55 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill against Donna K Hickman Related to: Memorandum & Opinion23 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ec) |
|
23 | 23
9
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 06/06 1:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. For all of the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner finding Plaintiff not disabled is AFFIRMED. (ec) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 12/11 11:31 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Answer filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Jeong, In) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Mon 11/06 12:54 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by plaintiff Donna K Hickman. Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Rosales, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/04 10:15 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Stipulation for Extension of Time19 . Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including November 1, 2017, in which to prepare and deliver Plaintiff's brief in support of her complaint; defendant's brief in opposition is due on or before December 6, 2017; any reply by plaintiff will be due on or before December 20, 2017. (ec) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 10/04 9:39 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Donna K Hickman.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Tue 08/01 11:41 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Stipulation for Extension of Time17 . Plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including September 29, 2017, in which to prepare and deliver Plaintiff's brief in support of the complaint; defendant's brief in opposition is due on or before November 3, 2017; any reply by plaintiff will be due on or before November 17, 2017. (ec) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/01 10:59 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Donna K Hickman.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Administrative Record
Tue 06/27 10:01 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Jeong, In) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 9 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/27 9:45 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Jeong, In) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Notice of Judicial Move to Roybal Federal Building
Tue 06/06 2:32 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective June 1, 2017, Judge Standish is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 640 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV17-475 GJS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 9:40 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney In Seon Jeong added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Jeong, In) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Mon 04/03 1:41 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Mon 04/03 1:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Donna K Hickman, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/30/2017, answer due 7/28/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/20 10:12 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ec) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 10:11 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ec) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/20 10:09 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting3 Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (ec) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donna K Hickman, (Rosales, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 5:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Donna K Hickman. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 5:46 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Donna K Hickman. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 5:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Donna K Hickman. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Donna K Hickman. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Donna K Hickman(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) |