Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Emily C Marks
Referred: Jerusha T Adams
Case #: 2:17-cv-00152
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2017
Terminated:Oct 28, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 4:03 AM CDT
Defendant
HB&G Building Products, Inc.
2 North Jackson Street Suite 605
Montgomery, AL 36104
Represented By
Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Tiffany Parrish Rainbolt
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Mack
HB&G Building Products, Inc. 350 Hendrix Road
Troy, AL 36081
Represented By
Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Tiffany Parrish Rainbolt
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info
Defendant
Lance Servais
HB&G Building Products, Inc. 350 Hendrix Road
Troy, AL 36081
Represented By
Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Tiffany Parrish Rainbolt
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn G. Camp
Represented By
Alicia Kay Haynes
Haynes & Haynes, PC
contact info
Sonya C. Edwards
Haynes & Haynes, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Thursday, October 28, 2021
103 103 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/28 3:24 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Any party may, for good cause shown, reopen this action within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order; Costs are taxed as paid; It is further ORDERED that all deadlines are terminated and all motions are denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/28/2021.(es, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist
102 102 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/28 9:08 AM
Joint NOTICE of Settlement by HB&G Building Products, Inc., Lance Servais, Glenn G. Camp (Lightfoot, Warren) Modified on 10/28/2021 to clarify docket text and to add plf as flier (qc/es, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
101 101 motion Seal Thu 10/21 5:34 PM
MOTION to Seal Trial (Exhibits 2 and 3) by HB&G Building Products, Inc., Lance Servais. (Lightfoot, Warren)
Related: [-]
100 100 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/21 5:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re96 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Reply to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections and Objection to Motion in Limine filed by HB&G Building Products, Inc., Lance Servais. (Lightfoot, Warren)
Related: [-]
99 99 respoth Reply Brief Thu 10/21 5:02 PM
REPLY BRIEF re91 Deposition Designations Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections filed by Glenn G. Camp. (Haynes, Alicia)
Related: [-]
98 98 respoth Reply Brief Thu 10/21 5:01 PM
REPLY BRIEF re92 Objection to Plaintiff's Witness List for Trial filed by Glenn G. Camp. (Haynes, Alicia)
Related: [-]
97 97 respoth Reply Brief Thu 10/21 4:59 PM
REPLY BRIEF re90 Exhibit List Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections filed by Glenn G. Camp. (Haynes, Alicia)
Related: [-]