New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:17-bk-15258
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2017
Terminated:Jun 11, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Nov 30, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cinram Group, Inc., Debtor
220 S Orange Ave
Livingston, NJ 07039-5804
Represented By
Kenneth A. Rosen
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Debtor
Cinram Group, Inc.
220 S Orange Ave
Livingston, NJ 07039-5804
Represented By
Michael Savetsky
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Kenneth A. Rosen
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Mary E. Seymour
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Lowenstein Sandler
contact info
Debtor
Cinram Operations, Inc.

,
Represented By
Mary E. Seymour
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Debtor
Cinram Property Group, LLC

,
Represented By
Mary E. Seymour
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 6:06 PM EDT
Attorney
Cole Schotz P.C.
Court Plaza North 25 Main Street
Hackensack, NJ 07602
Represented By
Warren A. Usatine
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
SIR
Represented By
Marita S. Erbeck
Drinker Biddle Reath
contact info
Creditor
Technicolor Home Entertainment Services, Inc.
Represented By
Ryan D Stottmann
Law Firm Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht
contact info
Clement J Farley
Mccarter & English
contact info
Jeffrey Thomas Testa
Mccarter & English
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Cole Schotz P.C. 25 Main Street Court Plaza North
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Warren A. Usatine
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Ryan T. Jareck
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
EisnerAmper LLP
111 Wood Avenue South
Iselin, NJ 08830
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee.
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 13, 2019
662 662 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 06/14 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
661 661 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 06/14 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
660 660 order Final Decree Tue 06/11 1:05 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (wdh)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 06/11 1:07 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (wdh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
659 659 order To Close Case Tue 06/11 9:10 AM
Order to Close Case and Directing Entry of Final Decree (Case Number: 2:2017-bk-15258-VFP). Reason: Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/10/2019. (jf)
Related: [-] 628 Notice of Intention to Close Case
Friday, June 07, 2019
658 658 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
657 657 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
656 656 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
655 655 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
654 654 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
653 653 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
652 652 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 06/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]