47 Hillside Road Corp.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Louis A Scarcella |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-71567 |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Debtor
47 Hillside Road Corp.
47 Hillside Rd
Southampton, NY 11968-3731 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Kenneth Kirschenbaum
Kirschenbaum & Kirschenbaum 200 Garden City Plaza Suite 500
Garden City, NY 11530 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 03/18/2017 12:03 AM EDT |
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
court
Prior Filings
Fri 03/17 12:48 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 16-73469 las ( Dismissed on 11/03/2016) (ssw) |
||
utility
~Force Judge Assignment
Fri 03/17 12:49 PM
Judge Assigned Due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. (ssw) |
||
utility
~Force Trustee Assignment
Fri 03/17 12:50 PM
341(a) meeting to be held on 04/13/2017 at 10:30 AM at Room 563, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (ssw) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Fri 03/17 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00. Receipt Number 249884. (SW) (admin) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 03/17 12:47 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by 47 Hillside Road Corp. (ssw) |
|
2 | 2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 7
Fri 03/17 12:53 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Partnership Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(b)due by 3/17/2017. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 3/17/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/17/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/31/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/31/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/31/2017. Schedule G due 3/31/2017. Schedule H due 3/31/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/31/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/31/2017. (ssw) |
|
3 | 3
court
Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset
Fri 03/17 12:55 PM
Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (ssw) |