Boudreaux v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02249 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Boudreaux
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/07 9:54 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- originally filed as rec. doc. 16441 in master case 14-md-2592(dw) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:19 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 3:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson and Johnson. (ss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/17 2:22 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
32
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6031192) filed by Ruth Boudreaux.Attorney Edward A. Wallace added to party Ruth Boudreaux(pty:pla).(Wallace, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |