Schultz et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02252 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Wesley Boucher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Schultz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/13 2:26 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:20 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 4:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (jls) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/17 2:29 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6031310) filed by Wesley Boucher, Stephanie Schultz.Attorney Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan added to party Wesley Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan added to party Stephanie Schultz(pty:pla).(Bogdan, Rosemarie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons BHCP |