Galindo v. Jones Motor Co et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Leon Schydlower |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00080 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rick Ridgeway
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jones Motor Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindolfo Galindo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
order
Judgment
Thu 05/31 4:20 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
47 | 47
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 05/31 4:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING46 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/30 10:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Jones Motor Co., Inc..(Lara, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Fri 04/27 9:07 AM
Text Order GRANTING45 Motion to Vacate entered by Judge Leon Schydlower. The April 30, 2018 jury trial setting is vacated.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(LS) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Vacate
Thu 04/26 5:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate by Jones Motor Co., Inc..(Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/19 6:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower: Pretrial Conference held on 4/19/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ERO.)(jg1) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 04/13 5:52 PM
ORDER, ( Pretrial Conference/Motions Hearing set for 4/19/2018 11:30 AM before Judge Leon Schydlower,). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 04/09 5:16 PM
Notice of Correction: re42 MOTION. **Motion was FILED as a complaint in error. Docket entry has been corrected.** (jg1) Modified on 4/9/2018 (jg1) |
||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/05 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT /Motion to Intervene , filed by Caroline WHC, LLC, Caroline Zurich American Insurance Company.(Webb, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint of Intervention, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 03/14 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by M. Mitchell Moss (Moss, M.) |
|
40 | 40
motion
Settlement
Wed 03/14 3:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement by Jones Motor Co., Inc.. (Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 02/23 10:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING36 Motion to Continue Jury Trial RESET for 4/30/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
minutes
Miscellaneous Hearing
Thu 02/08 12:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower: Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 2/8/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ero.)(jg1) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 02/02 4:30 PM
ORDER, ( Telephonic Motions Hearing set for 2/7/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Leon Schydlower,). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Continue
Mon 01/29 12:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue by Jones Motor Co., Inc..(Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Thu 01/04 11:04 AM
Notice of Correction: re35 Amended Complaint. **COMPLAINT DOCKETED IN ERROR. THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS DENIED. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.** (jg1) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/04 10:13 AM
PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jones Motor Co., Inc., Rick Ridgeway amending, filed by Lindolfo Galindo.(jg1) |
|
34 | 34
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/03 12:22 PM
ORDER re31 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (LS) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/13 7:04 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jones Motor Co., Inc., re31 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lindolfo Galindo(Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/07 5:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo Dated December 7, 2017 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 12/06 6:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Lindolfo Galindo.(Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 11/28 1:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosure, Witness List and Persons With Relevant Knowledge, and Expert Designation Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) and 26(2)(b) 11-28--17 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 1:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ Life Ambulance Service, LLC (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
28 | 28
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ RadAdvantage (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
27 | 27
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ Life Ambulance Service, LLC (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
26 | 26
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ El Paso Orthopaedic Surgery Group (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
25 | 25
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ Emergency Services of Texas (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
24 | 24
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ Del Sol Medical Center (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ Culberson Hospital (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
22 | 22
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/27 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo DWQ Acute Surgical (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/06 5:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 2/26/2018 09:00AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, Jury Trial set for 2/26/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/1/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2017, Discovery due by 1/28/2018, Motions due by 2/1/2018,. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/19 10:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo dated September 19, 2017 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 09/14 4:10 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Jones Motor Co., Inc.. (Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 09/14 1:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower: Status Conference CANCELLED on 9/7/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). **HEARING CANCELLED BECAUSE OF TECHNICAL ISSUES** (Court Reporter ero.)(jg1) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/01 5:42 PM
ORDER, ( Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/7/2017 08:45 AM before Judge Leon Schydlower,). Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (jg1) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 08/10 4:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leon Schydlower for all proceedings. Judge Frank Montalvo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 08/10 4:36 PM
ORDER VACATING11 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice
Tue 08/08 6:29 PM
NOTICE PARTIES' JOINT NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER by Jones Motor Co., Inc. re7 Scheduling Order, (Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Show Cause
Thu 08/03 1:09 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Lindolfo Galindo. (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/28 6:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, Response to Request for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Exhibit List 7-28-17 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/21 1:56 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/3/2017,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (lc3) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/20 6:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosure, Witness List and Persons With Relevant Knowledge and Expert Designation 6-20-17 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/26 10:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures 5-26-17 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/03 5:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindolfo Galindo May 3, 2017 (Mendez, Oscar) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/02 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 6/1/2017, Jury Selection set for 2/26/2018 01:00PM before Judge Frank Montalvo, Jury Trial set for 2/26/2018 01:00 PM before Judge Frank Montalvo, ADR Report Deadline due by 10/18/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 6/16/2017, Discovery due by 9/18/2017, Motions due by 11/17/2017,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/24 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Filing Parties' Agreed Proposed Scheduling Order by Jones Motor Co., Inc. (Lara, Oscar) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/10 4:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 5:05 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Oscar Arnulfo Lara ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9442458) by on behalf of Jones Motor Co., Inc., Rick Ridgeway.(Lara, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order
Thu 03/23 3:52 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/24/2017,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Supplement
Fri 03/17 4:04 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal Supplement to JS44 Civil Cover Sheet by Jones Motor Co, Rick Ridgeway. (Rincon, Carlos) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jones Motor Co, Rick Ridgeway (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9403672), filed by Jones Motor Co, Rick Ridgeway.(Rincon, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 9:25 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn) |
||
misc
To be Referred to EP Mag Judge
Mon 03/20 9:26 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (mn) |