Kubota v. Whitis Group, LTD
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Referred: | Jeffrey C Manske |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00071 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 38:4301 Right to Reemployment of Inducted Persons |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Whitis Group, LTD
Bradley Whitis 3301 E. Central Texas Expy.
Killeen, TX 76543 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erika Kubota
Herbert & McClelland LLP 3411 Richmond Avenue Suite 400
Houston, TX 77046 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
8
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Sat 09/22 4:31 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jk) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/21 11:53 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 05/21 8:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Whitis Group, LTD.(Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/16 4:45 PM
ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jch) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/28 11:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 1/31/2018, Discovery due by 1/26/2018, Motions due by 2/23/2018, Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/18/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) |
|
10 | 10
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/28 11:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Pretrial Conference held on 11/28/2017. PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY. JURY TRIAL SET FOR: June 18, 2018. SCHEDULING ORDER DISCUSSED. WRITTEN ORDER FORTHCOMING. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(tb) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 11/20 2:21 PM
ORDER RESETTING. Pretrial Conference reset for 11/28/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 11/16 8:10 AM
ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2017 10:15 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 08/18 12:07 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Erika Kubota. (McClelland, Shane) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order
Thu 08/10 12:12 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/08 3:27 PM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Jordan A. Mayfield added to party Whitis Group, LTD(pty:dft) by Whitis Group, LTD.(Mayfield, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/06 4:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erika Kubota. Whitis Group, LTD served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017. (McClelland, Shane) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Whitis Group, LTD. (jch) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 03/17 10:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Erika Kubota. (McClelland, Shane) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT & Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9403333). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Erika Kubota.(McClelland, Shane) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 11:24 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jch) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/17 11:24 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) |