Extreme Sports Divas, LLC v. Polartec, LLC
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00213 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Polartec, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Extreme Sports Divas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
53 | 53
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 04/25 9:06 AM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Polartec, LLC dismissing the case. (jls) |
|
52 | 52
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Wed 04/25 9:04 AM
ORDER granting defendant's32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/25/2018. (jls) |