Gagleard v. Infinity Insurance Company et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00806 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:03 AM MST |
Defendant
Infinity Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Munich Re
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Alan N Gagleard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 10/25 11:06 AM
ORDER granting the23 Stipulation and dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/24/2017. (LFIG) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 10/23 11:43 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Infinity Insurance Company.(Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/12 5:53 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file their Stipulation to Dismiss on or before 10/23/2017. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed by 10/23/2017, the parties shall file a Status Report with the Court on that date. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/12/2017. (LMR) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Report - Status
Tue 09/12 3:28 PM
STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by Infinity Insurance Company. (Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/07 2:48 PM
ORDER that the parties shall file their Stipulation to Dismiss on or before September 22, 2017. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed, the parties shall file a Status Report with the Court on that date. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/7/2017. (LFIG) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Report - Status
Mon 08/07 11:34 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Infinity Insurance Company. (Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/09 8:41 AM
ORDER the parties shall file a Stipulation to Dismiss on or before August 8, 2017. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed, the parties shall file a Status Report with the Court on that date. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/8/2017. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 06/08 5:06 PM
ORDER re:16 Notice of Settlement: The parties shall file a Stipulation to Dismiss on or before 8/8/2017. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed by 8/8/2017, the parties shall file a Status Report with the Court on that date. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/8/2017. (LMR) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 06/08 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Infinity Insurance Company. (Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims
Thu 06/01 5:59 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act4 : To the extent Defendant Infinity Insurance Company is seeking to compel arbitration and to stay this litigation until completion of arbitration its motion is GRANTED. To the extent Defendant Infinity Insurance Company is seeking dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's claims for breach ofcontract and bad faith, its motion is DENIED. The parties' stipulation to dismiss with prejudice count III of the complaint is DENIED as moot. This action is STAYED pending completion of arbitration as to Plaintiff's claims for breach of contract and bad faith. Ninety days from the date of entry of this order, and every ninety (90) days thereafter, the parties shall jointly file a status report with respect to the arbitration process. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/1/2017.(LMR) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 05/31 11:36 AM
ORDER granting the12 Stipulation and Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act of Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/30/2017. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 1:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act MOTION to Dismiss Count 3 re Unfair Claims Practices Act filed by Infinity Insurance Company.(Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/30 10:51 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Count 3 Re: Unfair Claims Practices Act of Plaintiff's Complaint by Infinity Insurance Company.(Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 05/19 4:52 PM
ORDER granting the10 Stipulation and extending the deadline to May 30, 2017 for Defendant Infinity Insurance Company to reply in support of its4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/19/2017. (LFIG) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/19 2:05 PM
STIPULATION re:9 Response in Opposition to Motion by Infinity Insurance Company.(Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/09 10:55 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act MOTION to Dismiss Count 3 re Unfair Claims Practices Act filed by Alan N Gagleard. (Gagleard, Alan) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 04/27 2:55 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the stipulation (Doc.7 ) and extending the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act until May 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/26/17. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 10:31 AM
STIPULATION re:4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act MOTION to Dismiss Count 3 re Unfair Claims Practices Act by Infinity Insurance Company.(Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/30 9:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-17-806-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Thu 03/30 9:13 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Compel
Thu 03/23 11:27 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Until Completion of Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss Count 3 re: Unfair Claims Practices Act by Infinity Insurance Company.(Harrington Bisceglia, Jeanmarie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-4, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/17 1:03 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14026020. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-806-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to return the attached Magistrate Election form, in paper, within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 12:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infinity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Infinity Property and Casualty Corporation for Infinity Insurance Company. (Submitted by Jeanmarie Harrington Bisceglia) (LAD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-052669. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14026020 filed by Infinity Insurance Company. (Submitted by Jeanmarie Harrington Bisceglia)(LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Fri 03/17 12:55 PM
***** State Court record received on 3/16/2017 ***** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alan N Gagleard: Certified Mail Receipt re: summons, complaint, jury demand, certificates upon Infinity Insurance Company by service on CT Corporation System on 2/23/17. **** Service of Process Transmittal docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/16/2017 for case management purposes. ***** (LAD) |