Salter et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00810 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:39 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Salter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Salter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 03/31 8:24 PM
Case Transferred to the Western District of Wisconsin via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 03/24 1:15 PM
AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Fri 03/20 2:37 PM
AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/06/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Wed 03/18 9:00 AM
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/17 10:52 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 17-0810 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Fri 03/17 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Patricia Salter, James Salter. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14027047 filed by Patricia Salter, James Salter.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |