Crescent Electric Supply Company v. Hooper et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | James A Soto |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00124 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:40 AM MST |
Defendant
Roy Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laura Hegedus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Hegedus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Edward Hooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Hooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reynaldo Orosco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Orosco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crescent Electric Supply Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
95 | 95
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 01/24 9:53 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (KEP) |
|
94 | 94
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 01/24 9:42 AM
ORDER pursuant to93 parties' Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 1/24/2019. (KEP) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
93 | 93
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/23 10:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Crescent Electric Supply Company.(Nagy, Tibor) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |