Chauncey Hollis v. Warden et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02055 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Mon 11/27 9:01 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS, 4:17-cv-04300 filed 11/16/2017. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transferring Case
Thu 11/16 9:33 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dml) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
attorney
Change of Address
Tue 04/18 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Change of address to La Palma Correctional Center, Eloy, AZ. Filed by Petitioner Chauncey Hollis. (dml) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - NON-FINAL
Fri 03/17 1:53 PM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before a United States Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Chauncey Hollis. (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Fri 03/17 1:51 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Chauncey Hollis. (car) |