Tarek Abu-Hajar v. Autonation, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02142 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 05:704 Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Autonation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Tarek Abu-Hajar
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 03/28 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Tarek Abu-Hajar. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 9:29 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 8:47 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Autonation, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 3:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Tarek Abu-Hajar. (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tarek Abu-Hajar, identifying Autonation, Inc.. (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tarek Abu-Hajar. (Haffner, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19535470 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tarek Abu-Hajar. (Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Tarek Abu-Hajar(pty:pla))(Haffner, Joshua) |