Lupe Zamora v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Karen L Stevenson |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00502 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Tue 07/03 5:33 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Fees awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of $ $2,707.20. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees26 (rh) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Mon 07/02 2:07 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $ 2,707.20. filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora.(Kuntz, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 04/10 12:01 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Related to: Memorandum Opinion and Order24 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is reversed, and the above-captioned action is remanded for further proceedings consistent with the provisions of the Memorandum Opinion and Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr) |
|
24 | 24
27
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 04/10 11:56 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED AND REMANDED for further administrative proceedings consistent with this Order. (See attachment for details) (hr) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Mon 11/13 2:41 PM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Saladino, Tina) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Administrative Record
Thu 09/14 9:46 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF LUPE ZAMORA (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Saladino, Tina) |
|
Att: 1 Scanned Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Scanned Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Scanned Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Scanned Part 4 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 09/14 9:37 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Saladino, Tina) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 07/18 1:52 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the concurrently filed Stipulation, the parties' request for an extension of time is granted. The time for Plaintiff to forward a written and detailed settlement proposal to Defendant, pursuant to numbered paragraph 3. of the March 27, 2017 Case Management Order ("Order"), is hereby extended from July 17, 2017 to August 18, 2017; and all other scheduling dates are extended as set forth in the Order accordingly.19 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (gr) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 07/17 3:37 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's written and detailed settlement proposal filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora.(Kuntz, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/03 10:04 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF LUPE ZAMORA filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Saladino, Tina) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/19 12:40 PM
Notice Update: Judge Stevenson will conduct all Court appearances in Courtroom 580, 5th floor located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Please update your records to reflect this change. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/05 11:21 AM
Effective June 8, 2017, Judge Stevenson will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, Suite 8100, on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 570 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/25 10:17 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV17-502 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Mon 04/24 1:53 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora. (Kuntz, William) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Mon 04/24 1:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/5/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to P. Myles, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carley Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Gina Perez, Unknown Title, on behalf of General Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Order was also served along with Complaint Documents.(Kuntz, William) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Return Receipts | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 9:19 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Tina R Saladino added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Saladino, Tina) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Thu 04/20 9:19 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final10 filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Saladino, Tina) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/19 1:25 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Lupe Zamora. (Attorney Tina R Saladino added to party Lupe Zamora(pty:pla))(Saladino, Tina) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/27 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) (rh) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 4:02 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to PLAINTIFF Lupe Zamora. (rh) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/27 3:57 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (rh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 12:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora. (Kuntz, William) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora, identifying United States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/17 12:40 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora. (Kuntz, William) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 12:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora. (Kuntz, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Lupe Zamora. (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Lupe Zamora(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |