St. Joseph Hospital of Orange v. PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
St. Joseph Hospital of Orange
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 06/15 8:01 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court. (es) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Remand Case to State Court
Thu 06/15 7:49 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT (Doc. 8) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Accordingly, the Court hereby REMANDS this Case to the Orange County Superior Court, Case No. 30-02016 00894580-CU-BC-CJC. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) is DENIED AS MOOT. Refer to order. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (es) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/06 10:26 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is ordered CONTINUED from 6/9/2017 to 7/14/2017 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Josephine L. Staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Response
Fri 06/02 2:06 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Planto Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,17 (Klein, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Elise D. Klein | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/31 5:34 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is ordered CONTINUED from 6/2/2017 to 6/9/2017 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) |
|
17 | 17
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 05/31 5:28 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: (1) REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, (2) VACATING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, AND (3) TAKING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER SUBMISSION [Doc. 15]. See document for further information. (tg) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 05/19 5:22 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange.. (Worobec, Kim) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 05/19 12:29 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan.(Klein, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Elise Klein, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Reply, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Reply, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Proof of Service | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 05/12 8:52 PM
OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 8 filed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange. (Worobec, Kim) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/20 1:26 PM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Approving Stipulation Continuing Scheduling Conference, Early Meeting of Counsel, and Motion to Dismiss12 . Before the Court is Plaintiff and Defendant's Stipulation continuing the deadline for the Scheduling Conference, early meeting of counsel, and Defendant's hearing on Motion to Dismiss. The Court approves the Stipulation. The Scheduling Conference is continued from May 12, 2017 to June 2, 2017, at 2:30 p.m., the deadline to conduct the early meeting of counsel is extended to May 12, 2017, and the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is continued from May 12, 2017 to June 2, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Continue
Tue 04/18 1:34 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference & Motion to Dismiss from May 12, 2017 to June 2, 2017 filed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange.(Popovich, Sara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 03/31 4:35 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange.. (Worobec, Kim) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/31 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange, identifying ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM and COVENANT HEALTH NETWORK. (Worobec, Kim) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/24 2:52 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/12/2017, at 1:30 PM. See attached Order for details. (tg) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 03/24 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. Motion set for hearing on 5/12/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Klein, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 8:56 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 5:30 PM
NOTICE to Federal Court of Filing in State Court filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan.(Klein, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 3), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 3), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 3) | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, (Klein, Elise) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Klein, Elise) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Superior, case number 30-2016 00894580 Receipt No: 0973-19535154 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Elise D Klein added to party PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Klein, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 11:54 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, filed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange. (esa) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/20 12:01 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff St. Joseph Hospital of Orange, upon Defendant PCM, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 2/23/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation.Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) |