Costco Wholesale Corporation v. Acushnet Holdings Corp.
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00423 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Acushnet Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Costco Wholesale Corporation
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Acushnet Holdings Corp
Terminated: 08/29/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | A lawsuit over Costco golf balls shows why we can't have nice things cheap (qz.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/28/2017 | |
2. | Costco files lawsuit seeking judgement that Kirkland Signature golfball did not infringe on Acushnet patents (golfdigest.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 10/04 8:08 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. This case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party pursuant to the parties'51 Stipulation of Dismissal and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (VE) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
51 | 51
misc
Stipulation
Wed 10/03 3:17 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by parties (Al-Salam, Ramsey) |