Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:17-bk-22405
Lead case is: 7:17-bk-22405
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-bk-22407 |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd., Debtor
75 South Broadway Fourth Floor, Office Numer 489
White Plains, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago |
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
misc
Terminate Party
Mon 03/22 3:03 PM
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent terminated from case. (Rai, Narotam) |
||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 03/22 3:04 PM
Case Closed. (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order, Final Decree
Mon 03/22 3:00 PM
Order signed on 7/27/2020 Granting Application for Final Decree (Rai, Narotam) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Operating Report
Tue 07/07 8:57 AM
Quarterly Operating Report / Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for Ezra Marine Services Pte Ltd for the Period of April 1, 2020 through June 30, 2020 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Operating Report
Thu 06/25 2:46 PM
Quarterly Operating Report / Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for Ezra Marine Services Pte Ltd for the Period of January 1, 2020 through March 31, 2020 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Operating Report
Fri 02/14 8:59 AM
Quarterly Operating Report / Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for Ezra Marine Services Pte Ltd for the Period of October 1, 2019 through December 31, 2019 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Operating Report
Mon 12/02 12:00 PM
Quarterly Operating Report / Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report for Ezra Marine Services Pte Ltd for the Period of July 1, 2019 through September 30, 2019 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Operating Report
Mon 04/29 12:50 PM
Quarterly Operating Report / Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for Ezra Marine Services Pte Ltd for the Period of January 1, 2019 through March 31, 2019 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Operating Report
Mon 04/01 10:54 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of December 1, 2018 through December 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Operating Report
Mon 12/31 12:11 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period November 1, 2018 through November 30, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Operating Report
Wed 11/21 11:24 AM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2018 through October 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Operating Report
Wed 10/24 8:56 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of September 1, 2018 through September 30, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Operating Report
Tue 09/25 5:11 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period August 1, 2018 through August 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Operating Report
Mon 08/20 5:07 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period July 1, 2018 through July 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Operating Report
Fri 07/20 4:25 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period June 1, 2018 through June 30, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Operating Report
Wed 06/20 4:56 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the period May 1, 2018 through May 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Operating Report
Mon 05/21 5:34 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period April 1, 2018 through April 30, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 05/07 11:22 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Unnecessary Deadlines (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Operating Report
Fri 04/20 1:30 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period March 1, 2018 through March 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Operating Report
Tue 03/20 4:41 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period February 1, 2018 through February 28, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Operating Report
Fri 02/16 4:42 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period January 1, 2018 through January 31, 2018 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Operating Report
Mon 01/22 8:46 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period December 1, 2017 through December 31 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Operating Report
Wed 12/20 2:27 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the period November 1, 2017 through November 30, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Operating Report
Mon 11/20 4:47 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the period October 1, 2017 - October 31, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Operating Report
Fri 10/20 1:23 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the period September 1, 2017- September 30, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Operating Report
Wed 09/20 4:26 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period August 1, 2017 - August 31, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Operating Report
Mon 08/21 3:12 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Period from July 1, 2017 through July 31, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Operating Report
Thu 07/20 1:09 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Period from June 1, 2017 through June 30, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Operating Report
Tue 06/20 11:34 AM
Monthly Operating Report for Period from May 1, 2017 through May 31, 2017 Filed by Aaron Solomon Applebaum on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Applebaum, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Wed 05/17 3:31 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Schedules filed (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 05/15 11:35 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Ravin, Stephen) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Schedules
Mon 05/15 11:16 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Ravin, Stephen) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Fri 03/31 1:13 PM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit -- already filed. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Fri 03/31 1:14 PM
Deficiencies Set: Atty Disclosure State. due 4/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 4/3/2017. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 03/28 1:43 PM
Case Joint Administration -- the lead case is Ezra Holdings Limited, 17 B 22405 (RDD). (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
misc
Add Party
Tue 03/28 2:49 PM
Party Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent added to the case. (Correa, Mimi) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 03/27 2:41 PM
Order Signed on 3/27/2017 (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases; and (II) Authorizing the Debtors To File Consolidated Monthly Operation Reports . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 03/28 1:47 PM
An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Ezra Holdings Limited (case no. 17 B 22405 (RDD)) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in case no. 17 B 22405 (RDD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Logue Togher, Claire) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 4:18 PM
Order Signed on 3/23/2017 Granting Application of Jeffrey C. Hampton for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
10 | 10
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 4:09 PM
Order Signed on 3/23/2017 Granting Application of Aaron S. Applebaum, Esq. for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
9 | 9
ans
Declaration
Thu 03/23 4:07 PM
Declaration of Robin Chiu in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 03/23 3:55 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/23 3:54 PM
Order Signed on 3/23/2017 Granting Application of Sharon L. Levine, Esq. for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Amended Voluntary Petition
Thu 03/23 3:29 PM
Amended Voluntary Petition. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Ravin, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Wed 03/22 12:47 PM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 4/3/2017. Schedule D due 4/3/2017. Schedule E/F due 4/3/2017. Schedule G due 4/3/2017. Schedule H due 4/3/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/3/2017. Declaration of Schedules due 4/3/2017. List of all creditors due 3/18/2017. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 3/18/2017. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 3/18/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2017 & 4/3/2017. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Case Association -Related
Wed 03/22 12:48 PM
Case Related to 17-22405 rdd Ezra Holdings Limited. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Case Related Flag
Wed 03/22 12:52 PM
Case Related to EMAS Chiyoda Subsea Limited in Southern District of TexasCase No. 17-31146 filed February 27, 2017. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Saturday, March 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Sat 03/18 11:45 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Aaron S. Applebaum filed by Dipesh Patel on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Patel, Dipesh) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Sat 03/18 11:45 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey C. Hampton filed by Dipesh Patel on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Patel, Dipesh) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Sat 03/18 11:44 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Sharon L. Levine on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Levine, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
ans
Declaration
Sat 03/18 11:36 AM
Declaration of Robin Chiu in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Ravin, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sat 03/18 11:18 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin of Saul Ewing LLP on behalf of Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.. (Ravin, Stephen) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sat 03/18 11:20 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-22407 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11762779. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sat 03/18 11:46 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-22407 [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11762795. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sat 03/18 11:46 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-22407 [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11762795. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Sat 03/18 11:47 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-22407 [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11762802. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |